Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Banská Bystrica

Dioecesis Neosoliensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marián Chovanec, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 13 March 1776
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bratislava
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Slovakia
  • Square Kilometers: 6,750 (2,607 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Biskupsky urad, post. schranka 107, Nam SNP 19, SK-975 90 Banska Bystrica, Slovenska Republika
  • Telephone: (048)41.25.726; 47.20.800
  • Fax: 47.20.827

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
13 March 1776ErectedArchdiocese of Esztergom Diocese of Banská Bystrica (erected)
30 December 1977Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Banská Bystrica (from Esztergom)
14 February 2008Territory LostDiocese of Banská Bystrica
Diocese of Nitra
Diocese of Žilina (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949231,078312,35074.0%195282231,03666309120ap1960
1969320,000442,69672.3%125101352,37010104ap1971
1980383,078532,14972.0%11371203,1927120ap1981
1990399,285567,60270.3%1241243,220120ap1991
1999320,335615,63152.0%151391901,685194121111ap2000
2000327,586606,68054.0%111481592,0601111121116ap2001
2001338,695601,63656.3%112511632,077189284115ap2002
2002355,706595,58159.7%112521642,168195294115ap2003
2003362,008586,42261.7%164592231,623191284117ap2004
2004348,627581,14660.0%162592211,577193295120ap2005
2006366,170590,49462.0%170612311,585192292122ap2007
2012401,300616,00065.1%109551642,446289278155ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013