Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomáš Galis

Bishop of Žilina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1950 BornSelice
6 Jun 197625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
28 Aug 199948.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
28 Aug 199948.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
25 Sep 199948.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bita
14 Feb 200857.1AppointedBishop of Žilina, Slovakia
15 Mar 200857.2InstalledBishop of Žilina, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Tomáš Galis:
Bishop Tomáš Galis (born ) Bishop of Žilina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Žilina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,621

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013