Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Baláž

Deceased

Bishop of Banská Bystrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1940BornNevolné
23 Jun 196322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
14 Feb 199049.2AppointedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
19 Mar 199049.3Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
27 Jul 201170.7DiedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Baláž:
Bishop Rudolf Balហ(born , died ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,860
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,587
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013