Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ján Sokol

Archbishop Emeritus of Trnava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1933 BornJacovce
23 Jun 195723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
19 May 198854.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trnava, Slovakia
19 May 198854.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Luni
12 Jun 198854.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luni
26 Jul 198955.8AppointedArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia
14 Feb 200874.3AppointedArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia
18 Apr 200975.5RetiredArchbishop of Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Sokol:
Archbishop Ján Sokol (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trnava

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trnava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,630
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Mar 2014