Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marián Chovanec

Bishop of Banská Bystrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1957 BornTrenčin
17 Jun 198931.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
22 Jul 199941.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia
22 Jul 199941.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
18 Sep 199942.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita
20 Nov 201255.2AppointedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
15 Dec 201255.2InstalledBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Marián Chovanec:
Bishop Marián Chovanec (born ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Banská Bystrica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,615
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013