Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alojz Tkáč

Archbishop Emeritus of Košice, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1934 Born
25 Jun 196127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Košice, Slovakia
14 Feb 199055.9AppointedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
17 Mar 199056.0Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
31 Mar 199561.0AppointedArchbishop of Košice, Slovakia
4 Jun 201076.2RetiredArchbishop of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Alojz Tkáč
Archbishop Alojz Tkáč (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Košice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOhradzany

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Košice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast