Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislav Stolárik

Bishop of Rožňava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1955 Born
11 Jun 197823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Košice, Slovakia
26 Feb 200448.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Košice, Slovakia
26 Feb 200448.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Barica
20 Mar 200449.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barica
21 Mar 201560.0AppointedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
16 May 201560.2InstalledBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Stanislav Stolárik
Bishop Stanislav Stolárik (born ) Bishop of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRožnava

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rožňava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,547
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast