Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrej Imrich

Auxiliary Bishop of Spiš

Titular Bishop of Castellum Titulianum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1948 BornMnišek nad Popradom
8 Jun 197426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Spiš, Slovakia
4 Jun 199244.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia
4 Jun 199244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Titulianum
11 Jul 199244.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Titulianum

MicroData Summary for Andrej Imrich:
Bishop Andrej Imrich (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Spiš

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Spiš.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013