Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Pasztor

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1912Born
30 Sep 193422.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 197361.0AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
3 Mar 197361.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
8 Nov 198876.7DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Jan Pasztor
Bishop Jan Pasztor (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrievidza
Ordained BishopNitra, Diocese of Nitra

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,083

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast