Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Štěpán Cardinal Trochta, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1905Born
29 Jun 193227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Sep 194742.5AppointedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
16 Nov 194742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
28 Apr 196964.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
5 Mar 197367.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Apr 197368.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
6 Apr 197469.0DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Štěpán Trochta (VIAF: 72198978)
Štěpán Cardinal Trochta S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrancova Lhota, Archdiocese of Olomouc
Ordained PriestTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopPrague, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Death PlaceLitoměřice, Diocese of Litoměřice
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Tomb, City, Cemetery, Litoměřice, Diocese of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 121
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Apr 1969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast