Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Vrana

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Octabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1905BornStribrnice
5 Jul 192822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
19 Feb 197367.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Olomouc, Czech Republic
19 Feb 197367.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Octabia
4 Mar 197367.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Octabia
30 Nov 198782.1DiedApostolic Administrator of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Vrana:
Bishop Josef Vrana (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Olomouc

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013