Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Feranec

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1910Born
18 Dec 193222.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 197362.9AppointedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
3 Mar 197362.9Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
14 Feb 199079.9RetiredBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
3 May 200393.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Jozef Feranec
Bishop Jozef Feranec (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica

EventPlace
Birth PlacePobedim
Ordained BishopNitra, Diocese of Nitra

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,081

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast