Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marián Bláha

Deceased

Bishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1869Born
29 Jun 189223.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 192051.5AppointedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
13 Feb 192151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
21 Aug 194374.1DiedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Marián Bláha
Bishop Marián Bláha (born , died ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiptovský Hrádok

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018