Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavol Jantausch

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Trnava

Titular Bishop of Priene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1870BornVrbové
21 Sep 189323.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 192251.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia
30 Mar 192554.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
14 Jun 192555.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Priene
29 Jun 194777.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Pavol Jantausch:
Bishop Pavol Jantausch (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Trnava

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013