Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Vojtassák

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1877BornZákamenné
1 Jul 190123.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 192043.0AppointedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
13 Feb 192143.2Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
4 Aug 196587.7DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Vojtassák:
Bishop Ján Vojtassák (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015