Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mořic Pícha

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1869Born
25 Feb 189323.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Oct 193162.5AppointedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
22 Nov 193162.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
12 Nov 195687.5DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Mořic Pícha (VIAF: 83860441)
Bishop Mořic Pícha (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSebetov
Ordained BishopPrague

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,931, Number 64
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast