Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karel Otčenášek

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1920BornČeské Meziříčí
17 Mar 194524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
30 Mar 195030.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
30 Mar 195030.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
30 Apr 195030.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
21 Dec 198969.7AppointedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
6 Jun 199878.1RetiredBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
24 Sep 199878.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
23 May 201191.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karel Otčenášek:
Archbishop Karel Otčenášek (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 61.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 299
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013