Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Hrdlička

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Thunudruma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1942 Born
1 Jul 197230.4Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
17 Mar 199048.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
17 Mar 199048.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunudruma
7 Apr 199048.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunudruma
1 Feb 201775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Hrdlička (VIAF: 19182827)
Bishop Josef Hrdlička (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelké Opatovice

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Olomouc.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,961
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Feb 2017