Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavel Konzbul

Auxiliary Bishop of Brno, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Litomyšl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1965 Born
28 Jun 200337.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brno, Czech Republic
21 May 201650.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brno, Czech Republic
21 May 201650.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Litomyšl
29 Jun 201650.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Litomyšl

MicroData Summary for Pavel Konzbul
Bishop Pavel Konzbul (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrno-Juliánov

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 21 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 29 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,949

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast