Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vojtěch Cikrle

Bishop of Brno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1946 BornBrno
27 Jun 197629.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brno, Czech Republic
14 Feb 199043.4AppointedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
31 Mar 199043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Vojtěch Cikrle:
Bishop Vojtěch Cikrle (born ) Bishop of Brno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,864

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015