Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop František Vaňák

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1916BornVojtěchov
5 Jul 194125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
26 Jul 198973.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Olomouc, Czech Republic
26 Jul 198973.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
26 Aug 198973.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
21 Dec 198973.4AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
14 Sep 199175.2DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for František Vaňák:
Archbishop František Vaňák (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,465
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015