Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hans Hermann Cardinal Groër, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Gioacchino ed Anna al Tuscolano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1919Born
12 Apr 194222.4Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
8 Sep 197656.9EnteredPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Sep 197757.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Sep 198060.9Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jul 198666.7AppointedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
14 Sep 198666.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
21 Feb 198767.3AppointedOrdinary of Austria, Faithful of Byzantine Rite
28 Jun 198868.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198868.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Gioacchino ed Anna al Tuscolano
14 Sep 199575.9RetiredArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
14 Sep 199575.9RetiredOrdinary of Austria, Faithful of Byzantine Rite
24 Mar 200383.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Hans Hermann Groër (VIAF: 40183659)
Hans Hermann Cardinal Groër O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Death PlaceSankt Pölten, Diocese of Sankt Pölten
Buried Place (Original)Cistercian, Convent, Marienfeld

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
  • a cardinal for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 99, Number 8,552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast