Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kurt Krenn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1936BornRannarsried
7 Oct 196226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
3 Mar 198750.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
3 Mar 198750.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
26 Apr 198750.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
11 Jul 199155.0AppointedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
15 Sep 199155.2InstalledBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
7 Oct 200468.2ResignedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
25 Jan 201477.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Kurt Krenn:
Bishop Kurt Krenn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015