Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Kajnek

Auxiliary Bishop of Hradec Králové

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1949 BornKutná Hora
26 Jun 197627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
4 Nov 199243.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
4 Nov 199243.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia
12 Dec 199243.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia

MicroData Summary for Josef Kajnek:
Bishop Josef Kajnek (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hradec Králové

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hradec Králové.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,992

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013