Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Teodoro Cardinal Valfrè di Bonzo

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1853BornCavour
1 Apr 187622.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Torino {Turin}, Italy
10 Jun 187622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
11 Jul 188430.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Costa Rica
27 Mar 188531.6AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
3 May 188531.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
21 Jun 188531.8InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
18 Mar 189541.6AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
27 Mar 190551.6AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
13 Sep 191663.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
13 Sep 191663.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
15 Dec 191966.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 191966.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
6 Mar 192066.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
25 Jun 192268.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Valfrè di Bonzo:
Cardinal Teodoro Valfrè di Bonzo (born , died ) Prefect of Affairs of Religious

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
  • a cardinal for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 219, and Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013