Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Chiesa

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1839BornMontà
14 Jun 186222.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 188142.0AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
20 Nov 188142.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
6 Aug 188242.7InstalledBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
7 Jun 188646.5AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
3 Nov 188646.9DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Chiesa:
Bishop Filippo Chiesa (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 187, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013