Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Luigi Zola, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1822Born
1 Jan 184522.7ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
9 Feb 184522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
21 Mar 187350.9AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
30 Mar 187350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
22 Jun 187755.1AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
27 Apr 189876.0DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Luigi Zola (VIAF: 44290547)
Bishop Salvatore Luigi Zola C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlacePozzuoli, Diocese of Pozzuoli
Ordained BishopSan Pietro in Vincoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,285
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 342, and Page 574
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017