Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albino Angelo Pardini, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

Titular Bishop of Zama Major


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1849Born
23 Sep 187122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
16 Jan 189343.8AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
12 Feb 189343.9Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
15 Dec 189445.7ResignedBishop of Foligno, Italy
22 Dec 189445.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
5 Jun 192576.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Albino Angelo Pardini
Bishop Albino Angelo Pardini C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSt. Peter in Chains, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 278, and Page 601
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017