Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan (Johannes) Nepomuk Remiger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Dadima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1879BornWeshorsch
24 May 190223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Dec 192950.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Dec 192950.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dadima
2 Feb 193050.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dadima
1946¹66.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
21 May 195980.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan (Johannes) Nepomuk Remiger:
Bishop Jan (Johannes) Nepomuk Remiger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013