Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František Zapletal

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1861Born
12 Apr 188422.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 193371.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
20 Jan 193371.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
19 Mar 193371.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
20 Aug 193574.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for František Zapletal (VIAF: 83971571)
Bishop František Zapletal (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenicka

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018