Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislao Hlad

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cediae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1908BornPlzčn
6 Jul 193022.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Feb 195042.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cediae
26 Mar 195042.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cediae
16 Dec 197971.9DiedTitular Bishop of Cediae

MicroData Summary for Ladislao Hlad:
Bishop Ladislao Hlad (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cediae

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013