Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kajetán Matoušek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Serigene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1910BornPraha
22 Dec 193424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
29 Aug 194939.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
29 Aug 194939.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Serigene
17 Sep 194939.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Serigene
5 Jun 199281.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
19 Oct 199484.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Kajetán Matoušek:
Bishop Kajetán Matoušek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015