Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Lebeda

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Novi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1913BornPraha
20 Jun 193724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
19 May 198875.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
19 May 198875.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Novi
11 Jun 198875.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novi
5 Nov 199178.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jan Lebeda:
Bishop Jan Lebeda (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,628
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Feb 2014