Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Zlatňanskż

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Bishop of Mons Faliscus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1927Born
22 Dec 195124.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 199770.2AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Jun 199770.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons Faliscus
20 Jul 199770.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons Faliscus
8 Jun 200477.2ResignedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Feb 201789.9DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Jozef Zlatňanskż (VIAF: 85062303)
Bishop Jozef Zlatňanskż (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTopolcianky, Slovakia
Death PlaceNitra, Diocese of Nitra, Slovakia

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,033
  • d: CB, 13 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017