Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduard Kojnok

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rožňava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1933BornVelkį Suchį
24 Jun 195622.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 199056.5AppointedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
18 Mar 199056.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
27 Dec 200875.4RetiredBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
27 Oct 201178.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Eduard Kojnok:
Bishop Eduard Kojnok (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rožňava

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,781
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013