Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Tóth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Ubaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1925Born
12 Jun 194923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
17 Mar 199064.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trnava, Slovakia
17 Mar 199064.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaba
16 Apr 199064.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ubaba
2 Apr 200478.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia
16 May 201589.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Dominik Tóth
Bishop Dominik Tóth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bratislava-Trnava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKostolný Sek

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,868
  • c1: CB, 19 May 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Feb 2018