Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Buzalka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trnava, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Cone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1885Born
14 Jul 190822.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 193852.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trnava, Slovakia
17 Mar 193852.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cone
15 May 193852.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cone
7 Dec 196176.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Michal Buzalka
Bishop Michal Buzalka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trnava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSvätý Anton

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast