Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edoardo Tonna

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

Titular Archbishop of Miletus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1891BornIzmir
30 Mar 191826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
26 Nov 192938.0AppointedBishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
9 Feb 193038.2Ordained BishopBishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
3 Dec 193746.1ResignedBishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
3 Dec 193746.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Garella
15 Apr 193947.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Miletus
7 Nov 196372.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Tonna:
Archbishop Edoardo Tonna (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013