Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Schwarz, S.D.B.

Bishop of Linz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1940 BornBratislava, Slovakia
29 Jun 196424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Oct 200161.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
15 Oct 200161.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
25 Nov 200161.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
6 Jul 200565.1AppointedBishop of Linz, Austria
18 Sep 200565.3InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Schwarz:
Bishop Ludwig Schwarz S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Linz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Linz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,077

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013