Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Leichtfried

Auxiliary Bishop of Sankt Pölten

Titular Bishop of Rufiniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1967 BornScheibbs
10 Oct 199124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
21 Nov 200639.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
21 Nov 200639.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rufiniana
25 Feb 200739.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rufiniana

MicroData Summary for Anton Leichtfried:
Bishop Anton Leichtfried (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sankt Pölten

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sankt Pölten.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013