Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Klaus Küng

Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1940 Born
23 Aug 197029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
21 Jan 198948.3AppointedBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
5 Mar 198948.4Ordained BishopBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
7 Oct 200464.0AppointedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
17 May 201877.6RetiredBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Klaus Küng
Bishop Klaus Küng (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBregenz
Ordained BishopS. Nicolas, Cathedral, Feldkirch, Diocese of Feldkirch

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sankt Pölten.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,141
  • r: Bollettino, 17 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 1 Aug 2018

Quantcast