Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Anselm van der Linde, O. Cist.

Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1970 BornRoodepoort, South Africa
19 Aug 199524.9ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
199827.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
15 Aug 199928.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
18 Feb 200938.4ConfirmedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Anselm van der Linde:
Abbot Anselm van der Linde O. Cist. (born ) Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Wettingen-Mehrerau.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2009
  • b: CB, 7 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015