Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Wechner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Feldkirch, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1908Born
26 Jul 193325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Innsbruck, Austria
31 Dec 195446.4AppointedVicar General of Innsbruck, Austria
31 Dec 195446.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cartennae
12 Mar 195546.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cartennae
9 Dec 196860.4AppointedBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
15 Dec 196860.4InstalledBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
21 Jan 198980.5RetiredBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
28 Dec 199991.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Feldkirch, Austria

MicroData Summary for Bruno Wechner
Bishop Bruno Wechner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Feldkirch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGötzis im Vorarlberg

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 202
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 847, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 Aug 2020

Quantcast