Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benno Elbs

Bishop of Feldkirch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1960 BornBregenz
16 May 198625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Feldkirch, Austria
16 Nov 201151.1AppointedAdministrator of Feldkirch, Austria
8 May 201352.6AppointedBishop of Feldkirch, Austria
30 Jun 201352.7Ordained BishopBishop of Feldkirch, Austria

MicroData Summary for Benno Elbs:
Bishop Benno Elbs (born ) Bishop of Feldkirch

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Feldkirch.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013