Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Kassian (Otto) Lauterer, O. Cist.

Abbot Emeritus of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1934 Born
20 Aug 195218.5ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
6 Aug 195723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
19 Aug 196834.5SelectedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
31 Aug 196834.5ConfirmedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
29 Jan 200975.0RetiredAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Kassian (Otto) Lauterer (VIAF: 25218688)
Abbot Kassian (Otto) Lauterer O. Cist. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Wettingen-Mehrerau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBregenz

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Wettingen-Mehrerau.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2009
  • b: CB, 7 Aug 2015
  • prof: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017