Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Turnovszky

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Ancusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1964 BornLuzern, Switzerland
29 Jun 199834.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
6 Mar 200843.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
6 Mar 200843.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ancusa
12 May 200843.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ancusa

MicroData Summary for Stephan Turnovszky:
Bishop Stephan Turnovszky (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,740

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013