Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antón Mákay

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1756³Born
14 Mar 177822.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Feb 177923.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 181862.4SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
21 Dec 181862.8ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
25 Mar 181963.0Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
10 Oct 182367.6SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
24 Nov 182367.7ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
8 May 182569.2DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antón Mákay
Bishop Antón Mákay (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoznava

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,372
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 280, and Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast