Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignác Szepesy de Négyes

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1780³BornEger
12 Dec 180222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
29 May 180322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
20 Sep 181939.1SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
21 Feb 182039.5ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
9 Apr 182039.6Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
25 May 182746.7SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
28 Jan 182847.4ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
16 Jul 183857.9DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignác Szepesy de Négyes
Bishop Ignác Szepesy de Négyes (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 316, and Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016