Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Károly Rimely

Deceased

Bishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1825Born
19 Jun 184823.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jun 184823.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 189368.3SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
15 Jun 189368.3ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
27 Aug 189368.5Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
13 Jan 190478.9DiedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Károly Rimely (VIAF: 58175865)
Bishop Károly Rimely (born , died ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary
Ordained BishopSt. Martin, Presbourg

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 408
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017