Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Ipolyi-Stummer

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1823BornDisznós
1 Aug 184723.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Aug 184723.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 187147.9SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
22 Dec 187148.2ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
14 Apr 187248.5Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
18 Feb 188662.3SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
7 Jun 188662.6ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
2 Dec 188663.1DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Arnold Ipolyi-Stummer:
Bishop Arnold Ipolyi-Stummer (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 359, and Page 408
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013